This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2020 at 09:03:58 (UTC).

ANDREW PRATT VS NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 ANDREW PRATT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2341

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PRATT ANDREW

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

DOES 1-10

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC

BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE

PEAK FORECLOSURE SERVICES INC.

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FKA BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE FOR THE CERTIFICATE HOLDERS OF THE CWALT INC. ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007-HY6

NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

CARA TONY ESQ.

CARA ANTHONY PAUL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

JORDAN S. YU

YU JORDAN S.

YU JORDAN SEUNGJIN

KUIUMDJIAN VERONICA

IDLEMAN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

11/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IDLEMAN

10/3/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IDLEMAN

Proof of Service by Mail

8/9/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Separate Statement

8/9/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/13/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/2/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - Declaration OF VERONICA KUIUMDJIAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41

2/26/2019: Declaration - Declaration OF VERONICA KUIUMDJIAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amended Complaint

10/23/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to First Amended Complaint

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUANCE OF CMC

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUANCE OF CMC

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

8/28/2018: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/14/2018: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

7/24/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

7/11/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

DECLARATION OF PEAK FORECLOSURE SERVICES RE NONMONETARY STATUS

5/25/2018: DECLARATION OF PEAK FORECLOSURE SERVICES RE NONMONETARY STATUS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

5/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE 2923.55; ETC

4/17/2018: PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE 2923.55; ETC

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 74; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT); Filed by Bank Of New York Mellon (Defendant); New Penn Financial LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED]); Filed by Bank Of New York Mellon (Defendant); New Penn Financial LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 74; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Andrew Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Andrew Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Andrew Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrew Pratt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF CIV. CODE 2923.55; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702341    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 74

BC702341 ANDREW PRATT VS NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC ET AL

Defendants’ Unopposed Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication

TENTATIVE RULING: Summary adjudication is granted as to issue 1 as undisputed facts establish that defendants did comply with Civil Code § 2923.5 by reviewing plaintiff’s modification applications and discussing with him options to avoid foreclosure and that there is no foreclosure proceeding currently pending. Summary adjudication is granted as to issue 2 as defendants have established by undisputed fact that plaintiff suffered no injury in fact and lost no money or property as there is no foreclosure proceeding currently pending. Summary judgment is granted for the same reasons summary adjudication was granted as to issues 1 and 2.