This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 07:26:53 (UTC).

ANDREW PARK, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ARC RESTORATION & CONSTRUCTION INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 ANDREW PARK, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARC RESTORATION CONSTRUCTION INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1006

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK AN INDIVIDUAL ANDREW

Defendants

ARC RESTORATION & CONSTRUCTION INC. A CORPORATION

ARISTA VELASCO GABRIEL ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHERMAN MARLEE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/7/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/7/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/7/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/13/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Andrew Park, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: ARC Restoration & Construction Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Gabriel Alejandro Arista Velasco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andrew Park, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: ARC Restoration & Construction Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Gabriel Alejandro Arista Velasco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andrew Park, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: ARC Restoration & Construction Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Gabriel Alejandro Arista Velasco (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less