This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2021 at 00:49:34 (UTC).

ANDREW KANG, ET AL. VS ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 ANDREW KANG filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5511

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KANG ANDREW

WOO GLORIA

Defendants

ALFARO ANA

ALFARO CHRISTIAN

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DARGENIO FRANK

KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPPILA BRIAN WALTER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

9/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

9/16/2021: Notice Of Rejection - Request For Dismissal

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Andrew Kang (Plaintiff); Gloria Woo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andrew Kang (Plaintiff); Gloria Woo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andrew Kang (Plaintiff); Gloria Woo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrew Kang (Plaintiff); Gloria Woo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOPPILA BRIAN W. ESQ.