This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2023 at 06:17:03 (UTC).

ANDREW HEATH VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 ANDREW HEATH filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9762

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEATH ANDREW

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF NORWALK A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

METROLINK A PUBLIC ENTITY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA REGIONAL RAIL AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

UNION PACIFIC CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN ESQ IGOR

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/13/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/13/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/13/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2024
  • Hearing09/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2024
  • Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANDREW HEATH (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF NORWALK, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANDREW HEATH (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF NORWALK, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANDREW HEATH (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CITY OF NORWALK, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less