This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 13:04:06 (UTC).

ANDREW DE NIESE VS BORIS DOBRIN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 ANDREW DE NIESE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BORIS DOBRIN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1731

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE NIESE ANDREW

Defendants

CARE SPACE INC.

DOBRIN BORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/30/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Andrew De Niese (Plaintiff); As to: Boris Dobrin (Defendant); Care Space, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andrew De Niese (Plaintiff); As to: Boris Dobrin (Defendant); Care Space, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andrew De Niese (Plaintiff); As to: Boris Dobrin (Defendant); Care Space, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHONEY KEVIN