This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 00:11:00 (UTC).

ANDREW ARELLANO VS J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 ANDREW ARELLANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against J B HUNT TRANSPORT SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8984

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARELLANO ANDREW

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

DIRT CHEAP INC. DBA DCG FULFILLMENT

INTERGRATED DESIGN

J.B. HUNT TRANSPORT SERVICES INC.

CALIFORNIA DISTRIBUTION CENTER LLC

BNSF RAILWAY

BRAND BUZZ CONSUMER PRODUCTS

ES SUTTON INC.

Not Classified By Court

BUDGO GROUP INC.

GALLAGHER-BASSETT SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISSMAN JOEL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LLP TYSON & MENDES

CRANERT TERRENCE L.

HSIAO LISA

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

MOUSA HALA

MCLEAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

6/3/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

6/3/2022: Answer

Notice of Lien

5/27/2022: Notice of Lien

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/7/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

1/11/2022: Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal

1/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/2/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/2/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF THIRD PARTY ACTION AND NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE

3/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF THIRD PARTY ACTION AND NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE

Notice of Lien

3/30/2022: Notice of Lien

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/14/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2024
  • Hearing10/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by California Distribution Center, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by California Distribution Center, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by California Distribution Center, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by Budgo Group, Inc. (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by BUDGO GROUP, INC. (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice (Of Pendency Of Third Party Action And Notice Of Trial Date); Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrew Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DISTIBUTION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Dirt Cheap I, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where E. S. SUTTON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JB Hunt Transport, Inc. is a litigant