This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 03:19:51 (UTC).

ANDRES YAYA VS GARDENA HOSPITAL LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 ANDRES YAYA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GARDENA HOSPITAL LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4021

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YAYA ANDRES

Defendants

AVANTI HEALTHCARE HOLDINGS LLC

PIPELINE HEALTH SYSTEM LLC

GARDENA HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC

GARDENA HOSPITAL LP DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 05/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 05/05/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/5/2021: Order - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference) of 05/05/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Andres Yaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Andres Yaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Andres Yaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Andres Yaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andres Yaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andres Yaya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVANTI HEALTHCARE HOLDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant