Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 12:48:57 (UTC).

ANDRES TESHE VS A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO., INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 ANDRES TESHE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8014

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TESHE ANDRES

Defendants

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO IN

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING

A1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO.

A-1 ALL AMERICAN COMPANY INC.

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO. INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK

SHU LILY TIELLE

Defendant Attorneys

LEAR SHERRY ANNE

TURNER STACIE LYNN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

4/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/9/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

10/31/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/30/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/31/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/31/2019: Answer

Request for Dismissal

10/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/8/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/8/2019: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Hearing06/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Association of Counsel); Filed by A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO., INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Sherry Anne Lear (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Jury Trial (- *plntf posted jury*) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING CO., INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andres Teshe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING WEST LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK ESQ.