This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2023 at 10:21:49 (UTC).

ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4185

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA MATLATL AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Cross Defendant

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARTANYAN NICOLE J.

Defendant Attorneys

PELCH MANAL H.

QUILLER DOMINIC A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/19/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/29/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/29/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/7/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Answer

7/5/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/28/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/28/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2025
  • Hearing04/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2023
  • Hearing10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2023
  • Hearing10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff, Andres Garcia Matlatl scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff Andres Garcia Matlatl scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY on 07/29/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY as to The People Of The State Of California, Acting by and through the Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Cross-Complainant); As to: The People Of The State Of California, Acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: The People Of The State Of California, Acting by and through the Department of Transportation (Cross-Defendant); As to: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less