This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 07:33:46 (UTC).

ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4185

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA MATLATL AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Cross Defendant

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARTANYAN NICOLE J.

Defendant Attorney

QUILLER DOMINIC A

Cross Defendant Attorney

PELCH MANAL H.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/19/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE MOTION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES;

7/17/2023: Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE MOTION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES;

Request for Dismissal

10/19/2022: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/19/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/29/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/29/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

7/15/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/7/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Answer

7/5/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/28/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/28/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/28/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2025
  • Hearing04/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2024
  • Hearing04/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Proposed Stipulation And Order To Continue Trial; Signed and Filed by: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); As to: ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 03/29/2024 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 04/12/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 07/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Continue Trial Date MOTION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES;: Name Extension: MOTION BY CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for 08/10/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Proposed Stipulation And Order To Continue Trial: Filed By: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/24/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANDRES GARCIA MATLATL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less