This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 18:40:30 (UTC).

ANDREQ SOTO VS CITY OF BELL GARDENS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 ANDREQ SOTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BELL GARDENS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5857

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOTO ANDREW

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

SHAWNAN CORPORATION

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF BELL GARDENS

EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING INC.

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 20

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION DBA SHAWNAN A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EISENBERG GARY CARL

EISENBERG JASON G

Defendant Attorney

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RUTTER MARK D.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

CASE AARON

PARTOS MICHAEL JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

1/4/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DSATES; PROPOSED - ORDER

3/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRE-TRIAL DSATES; PROPOSED - ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/10/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/3/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/3/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

3/10/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

3/10/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

4/15/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/27/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial and All Related Pre-Trial Dsates; Proposed - Order); Filed by EBS Utilities Adjusting, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by EBS Utilities Adjusting, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andreq Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andreq Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andreq Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andreq Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andreq Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andreq Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andreq Soto (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EBS UTILITIES ADJUSTING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SHAWNAN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF BELL GARDENS A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPAL CORPORATION is a litigant