This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 16:04:23 (UTC).

ANDREA RUEDA VS CHANDELIERS CREATIVE, INC., A NEW YORK CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 ANDREA RUEDA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHANDELIERS CREATIVE, INC , A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8007

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUEDA ANDREA

Defendants

CHANDELIERS CREATIVE INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

LEADING EDGE PRODUCTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LEADING EDGE PRODUCTIONS INC.

CHANDELIERS CREATIVE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL TIMOTHY A

HALL TIMOTHY A.

Defendant Attorneys

LAM DERRICK

LAM DERRICK K.

STODDARD PAUL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/18/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/24/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

12/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

12/8/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

12/8/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2020

12/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/08/2020

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/24/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/4/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/7/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/5/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • Hearing04/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Andrea Rueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 11:42 AM in Department 58; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Leading Edge Productions, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/08/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Derrick Lam in Support of Defendant Chandelier Creative Inc.'s Motion for Peremptory Disqualification of Assigned Judge); Filed by Chandeliers Creative, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Chandeliers Creative, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Andrea Rueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andrea Rueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Andrea Rueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andrea Rueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrea Rueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andrea Rueda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAM DERRICK