This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2023 at 06:24:25 (UTC).

ANDREA ROBINSON, ET AL. VS PORTERVILLE CONVALESCENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 ANDREA ROBINSON, filed an Other lawsuit against PORTERVILLE CONVALESCENT, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOEL L. LOFTON and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0674

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOEL L. LOFTON

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUHLER JAMES

ROBINSON ANDREA

Defendants

PORTERVILLE CONVALESCENT INC.

RENEW HEALTH CONSULTING SERVICES LLC

SOLORZANO CRYSTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

WALKER KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, PORTERVILLE CONVALESCENT, INC. AND RENEW HEALTH CONSULTING SERVICES, LLC, TO CONSOLIDATE, RELATE ACTION FOR ALL PURPOSES)

1/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANTS, PORTERVILLE CONVALESCENT, INC. AND RENEW HEALTH CONSULTING SERVICES, LLC, TO CONSOLIDATE, RELATE ACTION FOR ALL PURPOSES)

Case Management Statement

1/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Appearance

12/27/2022: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Ruling

12/8/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

12/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE RE: WESLEY CONCEPCION CSR #13383 FOR HEARING ON 12

12/8/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE RE: WESLEY CONCEPCION CSR #13383 FOR HEARING ON 12

Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY HEALEY, ESQ.; EXHIBIT;

12/1/2022: Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY HEALEY, ESQ.; EXHIBIT;

Proof of Service by Mail

11/30/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF

11/1/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Motion to Compel Arbitration

10/21/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

9/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION

9/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Motion of Defendants, Porterville Convalescent, Inc. and Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC, to Consolidate, Relate Action for all Purposes)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 01/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 21STCV38207, 22STCV01798, and 22AHCV00674 consolidated; case number 21STCV38207 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Porterville Convalescent, INC. (Defendant); Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by: Crystal Solorzano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Andrea Robinson (Plaintiff); James Buhler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 01/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore re: Wesley Concepcion CSR #13383 for hearing on 12--8-22; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAddress for Stephen Michael Garcia (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Andrea Robinson (Plaintiff); James Buhler (Plaintiff); As to: Porterville Convalescent, INC. (Defendant); Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC (Defendant); Crystal Solorzano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andrea Robinson (Plaintiff); James Buhler (Plaintiff); As to: Porterville Convalescent, INC. (Defendant); Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC (Defendant); Crystal Solorzano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andrea Robinson (Plaintiff); James Buhler (Plaintiff); As to: Porterville Convalescent, INC. (Defendant); Renew Health Consulting Services, LLC (Defendant); Crystal Solorzano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less