This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2022 at 03:47:35 (UTC).

ANDREA MITCHELL VS TARGET CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 ANDREA MITCHELL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4162

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL ANDREA

Defendants

HERNANDEZ JUANA

TARGET CORPORATION A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

HALM DAVID

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/2/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/2/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/2/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/2/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/2/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/2/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/2/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/28/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/18/2022: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF JUANA HERNANDEZ

5/12/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF JUANA HERNANDEZ

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2025
  • Hearing01/29/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ANDREA MITCHELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Dismissal of Juana Hernandez); Filed by TARGET CORPORATION, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TARGET CORPORATION, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANDREA MITCHELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ANDREA MITCHELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ANDREA MITCHELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANDREA MITCHELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANDREA MITCHELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANDREA MITCHELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW