This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 04:16:01 (UTC).

ANDREA METCALF

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 ANDREA METCALF was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAY, GUS T., PRIVER, MARK S. and CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3412

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAY, GUS T.

PRIVER, MARK S.

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MINSK NICOLE

Not Classified By Court

METCALF ANDREA

MINSK AVI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAZAROVITS KELLEY JEAN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

6/18/2021: Notice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

Minute Order

4/7/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/28/2022: Minute Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLEY J. LAZAROVITS RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF FILING ACCOUNTING (Declarations)

2/25/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLEY J. LAZAROVITS RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF FILING ACCOUNTING (Declarations)

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

9/12/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Minute Order

8/26/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - second Supplement to petition for accounting

8/9/2022: Supplement - second Supplement to petition for accounting

Minute Order

7/8/2022: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement

7/5/2022: Supplement - Supplement

Notice - Hearing

6/7/2022: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

5/10/2022: Minute Order

Petition - Acct or Order in Crt Created Trust (Subsequent) - First Acct and Report

4/28/2022: Petition - Acct or Order in Crt Created Trust (Subsequent) - First Acct and Report

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

10/14/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Order - Approving Account

10/24/2022: Order - Approving Account

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2024
  • Hearing04/30/2024 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketRejected Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSupplement (second Supplement to petition for accounting ); Filed by Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Ordered Transferred/Reassigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, Priver, Mark S., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF KELLEY J. LAZAROVITS RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF FILING ACCOUNTING (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Subject

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice - Commencement of Court Supervised Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZAROVITS KELLEY JEAN