This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2021 at 06:23:03 (UTC).

ANDREA FREEDMAN VS USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 ANDREA FREEDMAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2728

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDMAN ANDREA

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAPAZZOLA DAMIAN D.

CAPOZZOLA DAMIAN DOMINICK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MICHAIL MAUREEN MIRA

MICHAIL MAUREEN MIRA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/16/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/7/2020: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7/10/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

7/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

8/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Notice of Ruling

8/19/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Andrea Freedman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 49; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Andrea Freedman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Andrea Freedman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 49; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (to Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court); Filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andrea Freedman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andrea Freedman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andrea Freedman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrea Freedman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAIL MAUREEN M