This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 08:42:00 (UTC).

ANDREA FLOYD VS STEVE LAWSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 ANDREA FLOYD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against STEVE LAWSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5938

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLOYD ANDREA

Defendants

LAWSON STEVE

TEMPLE CITY PARK AND RECREATION DEPARTMENT A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY

TEMPLE CITY PARK AND RECREATION DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOVRETOVICH JOSEPH

GRUZEN ERIC M.

LOVRETOVICH JOSEPH M.

Defendant Attorneys

THOMPSON JEFFREY P.

DARROLL EILEEN PALMER

WILLIAMS WARREN M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/23/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/24/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

9/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Notice of Ruling

9/24/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/9/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/9/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

9/10/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/10/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal

9/11/2019: Request for Dismissal

Answer

9/11/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

8/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CMC

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO STEVE LAWSON'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE

8/22/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO STEVE LAWSON'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC GRUZEN ISO OPPOSITION

8/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC GRUZEN ISO OPPOSITION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN DUONG ISO OPPOSITION

8/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN DUONG ISO OPPOSITION

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire Action With Prejudice); Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Change of Firm Name); Filed by Steve Lawson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by City of Temple City Erroneously Sued As Temple City Park and Recreation Department (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Partial, with prejudice); Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Steve Lawson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff); Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Docketat 10:54 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Plaintiff Floyd's Peremptory Challenge Against the Honorable ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Plaintiff Floyd's Peremptory Challenge Against the Honorable ...) of 05/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andrea Floyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARROLL EILEEN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON JEFFREY P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS WARREN MCKAY