This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 14:19:19 (UTC).

ANDREA FAY HAIGH VS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 ANDREA FAY HAIGH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6608

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAIGH ANDREA FAY

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S LLC

ABS CA-O LLC

ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC

NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB LLC

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

SAFEWAY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORENO GERARDO

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; ALBERTSONS REALTY LLC; ALBERTSONS STORES SUB LLC; NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.; SAFEWAY INC.; A

9/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; ALBERTSONS REALTY LLC; ALBERTSONS STORES SUB LLC; NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.; SAFEWAY INC.; A

Answer

7/19/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

5/25/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/3/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION RE: DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.; ALBERTSONS REALTY LLC; ALBERTSONS STORES SUB LLC; NEW ALBERTSONS L.P.; SAFEWAY INC.; AND ABS CA-O LLC; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Albertsons, LLC Erroneously Sued As ALBERTSON'S LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Albertsons, LLC Erroneously Sued As ALBERTSON'S LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANDREA FAY HAIGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANDREA FAY HAIGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANDREA FAY HAIGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANDREA FAY HAIGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANDREA FAY HAIGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANDREA FAY HAIGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANDREA FAY HAIGH (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant