Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2020 at 04:04:30 (UTC).

ANDRE VRIESE VS FRANKLIN'S HARDWARE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 ANDRE VRIESE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FRANKLIN'S HARDWARE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9397

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VRIESE ANDRE

Defendants

FRANKLIN'S HARDWARE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KURZEKA RAYMOND

FRANKLIN'S HARDWARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLZMAN DANIEL MICHAEL

HOLZMAN DANIEL M.

Defendant Attorneys

ROBINSON ORION S

ROBINSON ORION S.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/1/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/21/2020: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Franklin's Hardware (Defendant); Raymond Kurzeka (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Franklin's Hardware (Defendant); Raymond Kurzeka (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andre Vriese (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLZMAN DANIEL MI.