This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 09:23:42 (UTC).

ANDRE ABED VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 ANDRE ABED filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2470

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABED ANDRE

Defendants

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JAGUAR LAND ROVER WOODLAND HILLS A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR NORMAN F.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/20/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • Hearing04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Andre Abed (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 12/22/2022; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Andre Abed (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Land Rover Woodland Hills, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andre Abed (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Land Rover Woodland Hills, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andre Abed (Plaintiff); As to: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Jaguar Land Rover Woodland Hills, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less