This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 01:25:44 (UTC).

AND ON LAW CORPORATION VS JAMIL ALAMIN WARD

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 AND ON LAW CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMIL ALAMIN WARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1317

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AND ON LAW CORPORATION

Defendant

WARD JAMIL ALAMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESLIE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/4/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

5/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/13/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/13/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

4/18/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by And On Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by And On Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by And On Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by And On Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by And On Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by And On Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by And On Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESLIE MICHAEL ESQ.