This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 11:57:12 (UTC).

ANAYELI MENDOZA-LOPEZ ET AL VS RMM INVESTMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 ANAYELI MENDOZA-LOPEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RMM INVESTMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7785

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

MENDOZA-LOPEZ ANAYELI

MENDOZA JOSE BAUTISTA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

RMM INVESTMENT LLC

Minors

MENDOZA JOSE DANIEL BAUTISTA

BAUTISTA-MENDOZA DIEGO ARMANDO

BAUTISTA-MENDOZA ANGEL DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

CASTELBLANCO ERIC E. ESQ.

WILLIAMS AIMEE CHRISTINE

Defendant Attorneys

CARROLL ROBERT III

SAFARIAN HARRY A. ESQ.

NOH JONATHAN D.

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

1/30/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

DECLARATION

3/20/2018: DECLARATION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/20/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/21/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/2/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/3/2018: NOTICE OF RULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

5/29/2018: Unknown

Unknown

5/29/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF HARRY A. SAFARIAN REGARDING MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE

7/2/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; DECLARATION OF HARRY A. SAFARIAN REGARDING MEET AND CONFER COMPLIANCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/10/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

7/10/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

8/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT, ETC

8/9/2018: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT, ETC

Unknown

8/21/2018: Unknown

RULING RE; DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

8/23/2018: RULING RE; DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REGARDING AUGUST 23, 2018 FAILURE TO APPEAR

8/24/2018: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REGARDING AUGUST 23, 2018 FAILURE TO APPEAR

HABITABILITY COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/20/2017: HABITABILITY COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Answer; Filed by RMM Investment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED HABITABILITY COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by RMM Investment, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REGARDING AUGUST 23, 2018 FAILURE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • HABITABILITY COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Anayeli Mendoza-Lopez (Plaintiff); Jose Bautista Mendoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIV1L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC687785    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 51

The petitions to confirm minor's compromise are granted. The children need not attend the hearing.

Case Number: BC687785    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 51

The petitions to confirm minor's comprise are granted. The minors need not appear at the hearing.