This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 18:50:17 (UTC).

ANATOLY ZASLAVSKY VS ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 ANATOLY ZASLAVSKY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1941

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZASLAVSKY ANATOLY

Defendant

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RULSKY JERRY

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

2/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anatoly Zaslavsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anatoly Zaslavsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anatoly Zaslavsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anatoly Zaslavsky (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RULSKY JERRY