This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 01:42:17 (UTC).

ANATOLIO S GARCIA, ET AL. VS GABRIEL ARTURO ORTIZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 ANATOLIO S GARCIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GABRIEL ARTURO ORTIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0800

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA GUADALUPE O

GARCIA ANATOLIO S

Defendants

ORTIZ GABRIEL ARTURO

ATICA NORTH AMERICA LLC A FLORIDA LLC

CALIFORNIA TITLE

LOPEZ CARLOS

A PLUS MAJESTIC INC.

RFG TITLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWNSETIN WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

7/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER EVIDENTIARY HEARING SETTING RE: QUIET TITLE)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER EVIDENTIARY HEARING SETTING RE: QUIET TITLE)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/10/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

3/10/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING - OTHER EVIDENTIARY HEARING SETTING RE: QUIET TITLE

3/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING - OTHER EVIDENTIARY HEARING SETTING RE: QUIET TITLE

Request for Dismissal

2/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/28/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL...)

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Amended Complaint

12/4/2019: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/26/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

4/26/2019: Complaint

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 09/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing - Other (Evidentiary Hearing Setting ReQuiet Title) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing - Other (Evidentiary Hearing Setting ReQuiet Title) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing - Other Evidentiary Hearing Setting Re: Quiet Title)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (re: Continuance of Hearing and Order); Filed by Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff); Guadalupe O Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing - Other (Evidentiary Hearing Setting ReQuiet Title) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff); Guadalupe O Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Reasonable Diligence on Atica North America LLC, A Florida LLC; Filed by Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff); Guadalupe O Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William Brownsetin (Attorney); Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff); Guadalupe O Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by William Brownsetin (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anatolio S Garcia (Plaintiff); Guadalupe O Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A PLUS MAJESTIC INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant