This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 13:24:27 (UTC).

ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA VS ALI HATAM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALI HATAM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHANIE M. BOWICK, DAVID J. COWAN and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2093

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHANIE M. BOWICK

DAVID J. COWAN

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOLOMYTSEVA ANASTASIYA

Defendants

ALI HATAM TRUSTEE OF THE ALI HATAM FAMILY TRUST

FRANKLIN MANAGEMENT REAL ESTATE FUND INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HATAM ALI

ZAHRA ZAMANI TRUSTEE OF THE ALI HATAM FAMILY TRUST

ZAMANI ZAHRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

SHAPIRO MARC STEVEN

HOCKADAY BRIDGET KATE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/1/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION T...)

11/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/20/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURTROOM AS...)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURTROOM AS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURTROOM AS...) OF 05/18/2022

5/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURTROOM AS...) OF 05/18/2022

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 05/25/2022

5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 05/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

5/5/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

5/5/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

Reply - REPLY REPLY RE MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/10/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY RE MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY REPLY RE DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

5/10/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY RE DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

3/30/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA on 08/30/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (5-7 Day Estimate) scheduled for 05/21/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (5-7 Day Estimate) scheduled for 05/21/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 updated: Result Date to 11/04/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA (Plaintiff); As to: ALI HATAM (Defendant); ALI HATAM, TRUSTEE OF THE ALI HATAM FAMILY TRUST, DATED MARCH 16, 1996 (Defendant); ZAHRA ZAMANI (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA (Plaintiff); As to: ALI HATAM (Defendant); ALI HATAM, TRUSTEE OF THE ALI HATAM FAMILY TRUST, DATED MARCH 16, 1996 (Defendant); ZAHRA ZAMANI (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANASTASIYA KOLOMYTSEVA (Plaintiff); As to: ALI HATAM (Defendant); ALI HATAM, TRUSTEE OF THE ALI HATAM FAMILY TRUST, DATED MARCH 16, 1996 (Defendant); ZAHRA ZAMANI (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less