This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2022 at 12:18:05 (UTC).

ANASHE ZARGARIAN VS THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 ANASHE ZARGARIAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0971

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZARGARIAN ANASHE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARTER LEE C

Defendant Attorney

CLANCEY CLIFFORD A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/24/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

3/25/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

3/25/2022: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

5/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Anashe Zargarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anashe Zargarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anashe Zargarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anashe Zargarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anashe Zargarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARTER LEE C. ESQ.