This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 04:47:07 (UTC).

ANAHITASADAT ABOLGHASEMI VS BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 ANAHITASADAT ABOLGHASEMI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1689

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABOLGHASEMI ANAHITASADAT

Defendants

BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA LLC

BOB SMITH VC CALABASAS LLC DBA BOB SMITH BMW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOGHTADER MICHAEL H.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/8/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • Hearing04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANAHITASADAT ABOLGHASEMI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANAHITASADAT ABOLGHASEMI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANAHITASADAT ABOLGHASEMI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant