Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 03:18:25 (UTC).

ANAHIT YEPREMYAN VS MARCO ABNOUSI

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 ANAHIT YEPREMYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARCO ABNOUSI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8689

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YEPREMYAN ANAHIT

Defendant

ABNOUSI MARCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELIKYAN GEVORG

Defendant Attorney

FARMER JOHN T.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/28/2021: PI General Order

Answer

1/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • Hearing12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Hearing06/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Hearing06/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marco Abnousi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anahit Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anahit Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anahit Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anahit Yepremyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less