This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 00:01:11 (UTC).

ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB ET AL VS LAYFIELD & BARRETT APC

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAYFIELD BARRETT APC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8811

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB

ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants and Respondents

LAYFIELD & BARRETT APC

LAYFIELD PHILIP JAMES

DOES 1 TO 50

KEOUGH JEANA (DOE 3)

LAYFIELD V LLC DOE 2

KEOUGH JEANA DOE 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON JEROME M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

31142 VIA COLINAS LLC (DOE 1)

LAYFIELD V LLC (DOE 2)

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/4/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

2/6/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO TAX DEFENDANT PHILIP LAYFIELD'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

2/26/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO TAX DEFENDANT PHILIP LAYFIELD'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS

Minute Order

3/8/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/4/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

1/9/2018: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS PHILIP JAMES LAYFIELD AND LAYFIELD V, LLC

1/9/2018: PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS PHILIP JAMES LAYFIELD AND LAYFIELD V, LLC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/22/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/6/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

11/27/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Unknown

11/24/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/25/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/10/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

8/10/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (1) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) (2) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) (3) NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF: (1) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) (2) AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) (3) NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/21/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club (Plaintiff); Anaheim Arena Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; (Motion Hearing; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club (Plaintiff); Anaheim Arena Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club (Plaintiff); Anaheim Arena Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club (Plaintiff); Anaheim Arena Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT AND MONEY DUE ON DISHONOR OF CHECK (CALFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 1719)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where THE LAYFIELD LAW FIRM APC is a litigant

Latest cases where Anaheim Arena Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACKSON JEROME M. ESQ.