This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 16:03:44 (UTC).

ANADORE, INC. VS MARIO RECIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 ANADORE, INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MARIO RECIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6914

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANADORE INC. DBA COMPTON PAWN SHOP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

DE LA ROSA DANNY

RECIO MARIO

CAMALES CARLOS A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STEINBERG KEVEN

UNGAR MICHAEL T. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LEE EUGENE DAVID

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

10/29/2021: Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVEN STEINBERG AND EXHIBITS

10/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVEN STEINBERG AND EXHIBITS

Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

9/10/2021: Case Management Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ...)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ...) OF 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ...) OF 08/31/2021

Case Management Statement

8/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Substitution of Attorney

7/29/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Request for Refund / Order

7/8/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Hearing12/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave (TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES); Filed by Anadore, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF KEVEN STEINBERG AND EXHIBITS); Filed by Anadore, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anadore, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anadore, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anadore, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anadore, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anadore, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE EUGENE DAVID