This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/19/2022 at 16:28:46 (UTC).

ANA ROSA JIMENEZ VS BENJAMIN TAM, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 ANA ROSA JIMENEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BENJAMIN TAM, M D ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0829

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIMENEZ ANA ROSA

Defendants

PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL GROUP INC.

TAM BENJAMIN M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GURBUZ ROBERT B

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/27/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/27/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/27/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2024
  • Hearing06/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2023
  • Hearing12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ana Rosa Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Tam, M.D. (Defendant); Pacific Orthopaedic Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ana Rosa Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Tam, M.D. (Defendant); Pacific Orthopaedic Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ana Rosa Jimenez (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Tam, M.D. (Defendant); Pacific Orthopaedic Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC ORTHOPAEDIC MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GURBUZ ROBERT B. ESQ.