This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 13:14:06 (UTC).

ANA ROSA GUZMAN PORTILLO VS MARLON JOSUE PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 ANA ROSA GUZMAN PORTILLO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARLON JOSUE PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1954

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUZMAN PORTILLO ANA ROSA

Defendants

PEREZ MARLO

PEREZ MARLON JOSUE

SANTOS BRAVO CINDY MICHELLE

SANTOS BRAVO JOSELLY JANETH

SANTOS JOSELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALAMATI SEAN F.

Defendant Attorney

CABRERA DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

3/16/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2024
  • Hearing11/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marlon Josue Perez (Defendant); Cindy Michelle Santos Bravo (Defendant); Joselly Janeth Santos Bravo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Rosa Guzman Portillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CABRERA DANIEL