Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 01:11:22 (UTC).

ANA MARROQUIN VS HASHTTAG, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 ANA MARROQUIN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HASHTTAG, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8336

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARROQUIN ANA AKA NANCY FUENTES

Defendants

PARK JONG YUN

HASHTTAG INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CLOSET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PARK SEAN

CLOSET INC.

HASHTTAG INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIRMABEKIAN SARKIS

Defendant Attorney

HWANG HENRY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFEN...)

11/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFEN...)

Notice of Ruling

7/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/21/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

7/13/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

7/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

6/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

7/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/23/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/28/2020: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Default Prove Up Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Hearing06/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default judgment as to defendant Closet Inc.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment as to defen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (entry of default as to defendant Closet, Inc.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default as to defendant Clos...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Sarkis Sirmabekian, Esq. in Advance of the Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default as to Defendant Closet, Inc.); Filed by Ana Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Ana Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ana Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendants Hasttag, Inc, Sean Park, Close, Inc. and Jong Yun Park) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ana Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ana Marroquin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLOSET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIRMABEKIAN SARKIS