Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 09:52:20 (UTC).

ANA MARIA ZAMORANO - ACOSTA VS LYFT, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 ANA MARIA ZAMORANO - ACOSTA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYFT, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1547

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMORANO - ACOSTA ANA MARIA

Defendants

LYFT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PARK JOYCE

PARK MOSES HARIM

PARK PAUL JUDONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFII DANIEL J.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/21/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2024
  • Hearing06/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ana Maria Zamorano - Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Maria Zamorano - Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ana Maria Zamorano - Acosta (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAFII DANIEL JACOB