This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2020 at 11:46:02 (UTC).

ANA LORENA LEANOS CASTRO VS PACIFIC GATEWAY DIST CENTER LLC

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 ANA LORENA LEANOS CASTRO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACIFIC GATEWAY DIST CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7794

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CASTRO ANA LORENA LEANOS

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

PACIFIC GATEWAY DISTRIBUTION CENTER LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

CHEP USA (DOE 1)

CHEP USA DOE 1

ROBERTSON PROPERTIES GROUP DOE 2

Defendant and Cross Defendant

CHEP USA DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHAH PRATIK H.

HAMPARYAN ROBERT

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KULUVA ARMIJO & GARCIA

CRANERT TERRENCE L.

JENKINS MICHAEL E

GRGURIC SHERRY

ROWLAND TERRY ALAN

CRANERT TERRENCE LEE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GRGURIC SHERRY

HITCHCOCK MEGAN CLARKE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS/PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL FACTS

8/11/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS/PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL FACTS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 03/24/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/27/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MSJ; TRIAL & FSC VACATED; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

4/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MSJ; TRIAL & FSC VACATED; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF REMY J. OBAS IN SUPPORT OF PACIFIC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF REMY J. OBAS IN SUPPORT OF PACIFIC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MEDFORD IN SUPPORT OF PACIFIC GATEWAY DISTRIBUTION CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GABRIELA MEDFORD IN SUPPORT OF PACIFIC GATEWAY DISTRIBUTION CENTER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

9/12/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) -

10/1/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) -

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

8/17/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/4/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Hearing09/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Hearing01/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department C at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder (- Trial Setting by Jury); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Robertson Properties Group (DOE 2) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Ana Lorena Leanos Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pacific Gateway Distribution Center LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Pacific Gateway Distribution Center LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Pacific Gateway Distribution Center LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCRBSS-COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION, APPORTIONMENT OF FAULT, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND EXPRESS INDEMNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pacific Gateway Distribution Center LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Ana Lorena Leanos Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Lorena Leanos Castro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697794    Hearing Date: August 26, 2020    Dept: 32

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

Ana lorena leanos castro,

Plaintiff,

v.

pacific gateway dist. Center LLC, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC697794

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 32 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT ONE:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE SOUTHEAST DISTRICT, JUDGE MARGARET MILLER BERNAL presiding in DEPT. F of the NORWALK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL SHALL GIVE NOTICE AND FILE PROOF OF SUCh WITH THE COURT.

DATED: August 24, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court