This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 11:52:33 (UTC).

ANA GOMEZ VS PRIORITY WORKFORCE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 ANA GOMEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PRIORITY WORKFORCE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0173

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ ANA

Defendants

PRIORITY WORKFORCE INC.

SOUTHWIND FOODS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMAILI JIHAD

Defendant Attorneys

DEVLING MADONNA L.

MARQUEZ TELLO GUILLERMO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/8/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/7/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/14/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

9/30/2021: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CIVIL ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION

11/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CIVIL ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

11/1/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO STAY CIVIL ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION

11/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER TO STAY CIVIL ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order to Stay Civil Action and Submit to Binding Arbitration); Filed by Priority Workforce, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CIVIL ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION; Filed by Priority Workforce, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Southwind Foods, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Ana Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ana Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ana Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ana Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWIND FOODS is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIORITYWORKFORCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVLING, MADONNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARQUEZ TELLO GUILLERMO