This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2021 at 15:14:17 (UTC).

ANA GABRIEL NAVARRETE VS ROBERT GUNN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 ANA GABRIEL NAVARRETE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT GUNN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1121

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRETE ANA GABRIEL

Defendants

BAILEY CYNTHIA

GUNN ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2024
  • Hearing08/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Gabriel Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ana Gabriel Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ana Gabriel Navarrete (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL