This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 02:56:30 (UTC).

ANA DELEON VS CITY OF SOUTH GATE ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 ANA DELEON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SOUTH GATE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4827

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

DELEON ANA

Respondents and Defendants

CERVANTES ERIC

DOES 1 TO 50

SOUTH GATE CITY OF

CERVANTES JOSE

CITY OF SOUTH GATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

GIBALEVICH DANIEL A. ESQ.

FISHENFELD ESQ. RACHEL E.

GIBALEVICH DANIEL ANDREW ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

SALINAS RAUL F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ANA DELEON IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ANA DELEON IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RACHEL E. FISHENFELD IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

7/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RACHEL E. FISHENFELD IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

8/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF ANA DELEON'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT: (1) DECLARATION OF RACHEL E. FISHENFELD, ESQ. (2) DECLARATION OF ANA DELEON.

5/25/2021: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF ANA DELEON'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT: (1) DECLARATION OF RACHEL E. FISHENFELD, ESQ. (2) DECLARATION OF ANA DELEON.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

3/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 11/02/2020

11/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 11/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/11/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF ANA DE LEON'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT;

7/13/2020: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF ANA DE LEON'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT;

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; (1) DECLARATION OF RACHEL E. FISHENFELD, ESQ.; (2) DECLARATION OF ANA DELEON

1/28/2020: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; (1) DECLARATION OF RACHEL E. FISHENFELD, ESQ.; (2) DECLARATION OF ANA DELEON

Request for Dismissal

1/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/28/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Enter Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF RACHEL E. FISHENFELD IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ANA DELEON IN SUPPORT OF BRIEF RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT); Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketBrief (Plaintiff Ana Deleon's Brief in Support of Default Judgment: (1) Declaration of Rachel E. Fishenfeld, Esq. (2) Declaration of Ana DeLeon.); Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (For Failure to Enter Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of South Gate (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH GATE'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FROM PERSONAL INJURIES BASED UPON: 1) CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 835 2) NEGLIGENCE 3) PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Deleon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694827    Hearing Date: July 28, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANA DELEON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF SOUTH GATE, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC694827

ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Dept. 27

Plaintiff Ana DeLeon (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants City of South Gate (“City”), Jose Cervantes, and Eric Cervantes for damages arising out of a trip and fall on a sidewalk. Plaintiff alleges she tripped and fell on a sidewalk located in the city of South Gate, and adjacent to property owned by the Cervanteses. Plaintiff has settled all claims against the City, and has dismissed the City from the action.

On Judicial Council Form CIV-100, Plaintiff seeks entry of default judgment against Defendants in the amount of $73,960.38 in special damages, $150,000 in general damages, and $925 in costs.

But, in the proposed judgment filed on July 13, 2020, Plaintiff seeks a total of $142,460.38 in damages, without costs. And, per Plaintiff’s supplemental brief, she now requests $100,000 in general damages. Plaintiff must file a Request for Default Judgment on Form CIV-100 that accurately reflects the amounts sought in the proposed judgment. Accordingly, the request for a default judgment is again denied without prejudice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH GATE CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SOUTH GATE A is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHENFELD RACHEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBALEVICH DANIEL A. ESQ.