This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 23:46:53 (UTC).

ANA DEGANTE, ET AL. VS SHIRLEY CANARY ECHEGARAY

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 ANA DEGANTE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against SHIRLEY CANARY ECHEGARAY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6487

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SARMIENTO JOSE

DEGANTE ANA

CAMPOS VIRGINIA

Defendant

ECHEGARAY SHIRLEY CANARY AKA SHIRLEY SPRUNCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOWE STEVEN T.

Defendant Attorney

UTZURRUM JOE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

7/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON

Notice of Settlement

6/28/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/28/2021

6/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/28/2021

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/29/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS' LIMITED DISCOVERY

6/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS' LIMITED DISCOVERY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHYRLEY SPRUNCK IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP SECTION 425.16)

4/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHYRLEY SPRUNCK IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP SECTION 425.16)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHYRLEY SPRUNCK IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

4/27/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHYRLEY SPRUNCK IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

4/27/2021: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/03/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/04/2021

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/04/2021

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/4/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 37; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND PROPOSED ORDER THEREON); Filed by Ana Degante (Plaintiff); Jose Sarmiento (Plaintiff); Virginia Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 2:49 PM in Department 34; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Ana Degante (Plaintiff); Jose Sarmiento (Plaintiff); Virginia Campos (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Ana Degante (Plaintiff); Jose Sarmiento (Plaintiff); Virginia Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/04/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ana Degante (Plaintiff); Jose Sarmiento (Plaintiff); Virginia Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ana Degante (Plaintiff); Jose Sarmiento (Plaintiff); Virginia Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ana Degante (Plaintiff); Jose Sarmiento (Plaintiff); Virginia Campos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less