This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2021 at 01:08:34 (UTC).

AMY COHEN VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 AMY COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3231

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN AMY

Defendants

ALPHA BETA COMPANY DBA RALPHS

ATHERTON MAGNOLIA LLC

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA RALPHS

SHEVELL MAGNOLIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

THE KROGER CO. DBA RALPHS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDIN ERIC GRAHAM

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/23/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

12/16/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/8/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2024
  • Hearing11/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • Hearing05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • Hearing05/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amy Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amy Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amy Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amy Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amy Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amy Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDIN ERIC G. ESQ.