This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 07:44:26 (UTC).

AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., A CORPORATION VS RK COMPANY, INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CIGAR CARTEL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RK COMPANY, INC WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CIGAR CARTEL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0793

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

PREVOST THOMAS RUFFIN AKA THOMAS R. PREVOST AKA THOMAS PREVOST

PREVOST WILLIAM SIDNEY III AKA WILLIAM S. PREVOST AKA WILLIAM PREVOST III AKA WILLIAM PREVOST

RK COMPANY INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CIGAR CARTEL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIDER PORTER MARTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/3/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Hearing11/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RK COMPANY INC. DBA CIGAR CARTEL is a litigant

Latest cases where Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDER PORTER MARTINA