This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 12:10:07 (UTC).

AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC., A CORPORATION VS LL & J ENTERPRISE, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LL J ENTERPRISE, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1251

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

TERTERYAN AN INDIVIDUAL ARPINE

LL & J ENTERPRISE A CORPORATION DBA ACRYLIC WORKS DENTAL LAB

Not Classified By Court

GALADZHYAN GUKAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FOSTER RICHARD M.

Other Attorneys

JENKINS STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

5/16/2022: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

3/18/2022: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/18/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

3/22/2022: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Summary of the Case

4/26/2021: Summary of the Case

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

4/26/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/26/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

4/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

5/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Default Judgment

5/5/2021: Default Judgment

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

5/7/2021: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

5/10/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

5/10/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/2/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim; Filed by: Gukas Galadzhyan (Non-Party); As to: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant); Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant); County: Los Angeles; Principal: 75679.09; Interest: 6551.94; Costs: 197.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant); Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant); Costs: 197.00; Interest: 6551.94; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 03/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant); Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant); County: Los Angeles; Principal: 75679.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/05/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 04/26/2021 to 05/05/2021; Result Date changed from 05/05/2021 to 05/05/2021; As To Parties changed from Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant), LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant) to Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant), LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to LL & J Enterprise, a corporation; On the Complaint filed by Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation on 10/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/14/2020; Service Cost: 192.34; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/14/2020; Service Cost: 192.34; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant); Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant); Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Amur Equipment Finance, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LL & J Enterprise, a corporation (Defendant); Arpine Terteryan, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LL & J ENTERPRISE A CORPORATION DBA ACRYLIC WORKS DENTAL LAB is a litigant

Latest cases where Amur Equipment Finance, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS STEPHEN