This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 10:00:36 (UTC).

AMPAIPORN MILLER VS RUBEN BENITEZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by AMPAIPORN MILLER against RUBEN BENITEZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8765

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MILLER AMPAIPORN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

BENITEZ RUBEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LIE JASON Y. ESQ.

LIE JASON YAU ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HONG LYNDON HYON

 

Court Documents

Motion to Consolidate

11/15/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Related Case

8/20/2019: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/20/2019

8/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 08/20/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

8/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Answer

8/22/2019: Answer

SUMMONS -

3/20/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • Hearing03/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Hearing03/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Hearing03/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Hearing12/16/2019 at 13:30 PM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate; Filed by Ruben Benitez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ruben Benitez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Notice of Related Case) of 08/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Ruben Benitez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ampaiporn Miller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698765    Hearing Date: December 16, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

ampaiporn miller,

Plaintiff,

v.

ruben benitez,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC698765

(related to 18STLC04633)

Hearing Date: December 16, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO consolidate

Defendant Ruben Benitez (“Defendant”) moves to consolidate this case with Rodriguez, et al., v. Benitez, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. 18STLC04633) for all purposes. Per Local Rule 3.3, subdivision (g), “Cases may not be consolidated unless they are in the same department. A motion to consolidate two or more cases may be noticed and heard after the cases, initially filed in different departments, have been related into a single department, or if the cases were already assigned to that department.” (Super. Ct. L.A. County, Local Rules, rule 3.3(g)(1).) The Court has already related these cases, and both are pending in this department. Consolidation is warranted as the cases arise out of the same motor vehicle collision. All parties have stipulated to consolidation. Accordingly, the motion is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Defendant’s motion to consolidate this case with Rodriguez, et al., v. Benitez, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. 18STLC04633) is granted. The cases are consolidated for all purposes. All hearing dates in Rodriguez, et al., v. Benitez, et al. (Super. Ct. L.A. County, 2018, No. 18STLC04633) are vacated. All pleadings shall be filed in Case Number BC698765. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 16, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court