This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 02:17:31 (UTC).

AMOS AGUILERA VS MANGAN INC

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 AMOS AGUILERA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MANGAN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8766

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILERA AMOS

Defendant

MANGAN INCORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/3/2018: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 510 AND 1198 (UNPAID OVERTIME); ETC

1/3/2018: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 510 AND 1198 (UNPAID OVERTIME); ETC

CIVIL DEPOSIT

1/3/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/1/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order

1/26/2018: Order

Minute Order

1/26/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

2/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/20/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration

2/20/2018: Declaration

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

3/6/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Order

2/26/2018: Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2018
  • DocketCase File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 323; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Amos Aguilera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketOrder -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Amos Aguilera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Amos Aguilera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amos Aguilera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal -

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Amos Aguilera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Docketat 1:00 PM in Department 323; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketOrder -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM-CLASS ACTIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amos Aguilera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE 510 AND 1198 (UNPAID OVERTIME); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

LAWYERS for JUSTICE, PC 410 West Arden Avenue, Suite 203

ORIGINAL

I luann “ane®

. » -+ e

- .. .M‘

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL CIVIL WEST

AMOS AGUILERA, individually, and on Case No.: BC688766

behalf of other members of the general public

similarly situated; Honorable Elihu M. Berle Department 323

Plaintiff,

| CLASS ACTION

PROOF OF SERVICE

MANGAN, INC., a California corporation; and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive,

Defendants.

Complaint Filed: January 3, 2018 Jury Trial Date: None Set

PROOF OF SERVICE

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANGAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN