This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:41:20 (UTC).

AMORA RACHELLE MAGNA, , ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 AMORA RACHELLE MAGNA, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5606

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEETLEY JACK

BEETLEY KATHERINE

BEETLEY RUDY

MAGNA AMORA RACHELLE

MAGNA DOVID

MAGNA VONA

RABINOVICH MENACHEM

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVITT JAY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/11/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/27/2022

5/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 05/27/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

5/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • Docketat 09:52 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Determination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Determination) of 05/27/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amora Rachelle Magna, (Plaintiff); Dovid Magna, (Plaintiff); Vona Magna, (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amora Rachelle Magna, (Plaintiff); Dovid Magna, (Plaintiff); Vona Magna, (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amora Rachelle Magna, (Plaintiff); Dovid Magna, (Plaintiff); Vona Magna, (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant