Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2021 at 05:16:43 (UTC).

AMMARI, RAZAN VS AMMARI, SAMI F.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 AMMARI, RAZAN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against AMMARI, SAMI F. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COCHRAN, STEVE and RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3216

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COCHRAN, STEVE

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

AMMARI RAZAN

Claimant

RODAS ROSALIA

Respondent

AMMARI SAMI F.

Not Classified By Court

RAZAN AMMARI BROOKHURST REHABILITATION AND MEDIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Claimant Attorneys

KLOSK MICHAEL JONATHAN

TAMER STEVEN MICHAEL

MARSHALL BROOKS PATERSON

 

Court Documents

FL_General Family Law - Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed

12/28/2020: FL_General Family Law - Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/14/2019: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

5/31/2019: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

6/27/2019: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

7/22/2019: Minute Order

Subpoena

8/5/2019: Subpoena

Subpoena

8/5/2019: Subpoena

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application Re: Request to Amend Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Respondent on August 9, 2019

8/9/2019: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte Application Re: Request to Amend Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Respondent on August 9, 2019

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Modified

8/13/2019: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Modified

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Modified

8/13/2019: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Modified

Minute Order

8/23/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

8/28/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

9/3/2019: Minute Order

FL_General Family Law - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

10/3/2019: FL_General Family Law - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Filed With Proof of Service

10/29/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Filed With Proof of Service

Appeal Document - Declaration

12/12/2019: Appeal Document - Declaration

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - Fee Waiver as to: RAZAN AMMARI

1/14/2020: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - Fee Waiver as to: RAZAN AMMARI

Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts

2/25/2020: Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B301612 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Opinion Received; Remittitur Due in 60 Days (B301612 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketRefund Approved (Court Reporter Transcript); Filed by Claimant Reporter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketRefund Approved (Unused Transcript); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit (NOA 9/24/19 APPROVED: 5/5/20 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt (NOA 9/24/19 COURT REPORTER: ROSALIA RODAS )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRefund Initiated (Unused Transcript); Filed by Depositor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt (NOA 9/24/19 COURT REPORTER: ROSALIA RODAS )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRefund Initiated (Court Reporter Transcript); Filed by Claimant Reporter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 63, Cochran, Steve, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketRestraining Order - Amended; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSHALL BROOKS PATERSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLOSK MICHAEL JONATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMER STEVEN MICHAEL