This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2021 at 00:10:15 (UTC).

AMIRALI JIWANI VS SOLENIS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 AMIRALI JIWANI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOLENIS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY MOHR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2331

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTHONY MOHR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIWANI AMIRALI

Defendants

SOLENIS LLC

MACK RUSSELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JADHAVJI ALISHAN

Defendant Attorney

JUVINALL KATE E.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/12/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

7/23/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

7/17/2020: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Solenis, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Solenis, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amirali Jiwani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amirali Jiwani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amirali Jiwani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amirali Jiwani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLENIS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUVINALL KATE