Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2021 at 04:48:42 (UTC).

AMIRA HANNA, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SANDRA GUZMAN, ET AL. VS AHMAD S. KHALIFA, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 AMIRA HANNA, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, SANDRA GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AHMAD S KHALIFA, M D . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5325

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HANNA AMIRA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM SANDRA GUZMAN

GUZMAN SANDRA

Defendants

KIA FARNAAZ M.D.

EISNER HEALTH LOS ANGELES WOMEN'S CENTER

KHALIFA AHMAD S. M.D.

CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

POURSHARIF BORZOUYEH M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMAHAN CARL A

Defendant Attorneys

TROTTER MICHAEL

BRANDMEYER KENT T.

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/24/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Reply - REPLY HANNA - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/27/2021: Reply - REPLY HANNA - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

5/6/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/2/2021: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AMIRA

2/22/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AMIRA

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Complaint

2/10/2021: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2024
  • Hearing02/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketReply (Hanna - Reply to Opposition to Demurrer); Filed by Ahmad S. Khalifa, M.D. (Defendant); Eisner Health, Los Angeles Women's Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Demurrer); Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike (TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT;); Filed by Ahmad S. Khalifa, M.D. (Defendant); Eisner Health, Los Angeles Women's Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Farnaaz Kia, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Amira); Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Amira Hanna, a minor by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff); Sandra Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant