This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 00:15:01 (UTC).

AMIR ZAMYAD VS BARBARA BOHL ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by AMIR ZAMYAD against BARBARA BOHL in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5034

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ZAMYAD AMIR

Defendants and Respondents

BOHL CHARLES

BOHL BARBARA

DOES 1 TO 25

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/21/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

8/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

8/7/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

2/21/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/21/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 08/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amir Zamyad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695034    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

AMIR ZAMYAD,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

BARBARA BOHL, et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC695034

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 19, 2019

Plaintiff, Amir Zamyad filed this action against Defendants, Barbara and Charles Bohl for damages arising out of an automobile v. horse accident. Plaintiff filed the complaint on 2/21/18. Plaintiff has not, to date, filed proof of service of the summons and complaint on Defendants. Plaintiff failed to appear at the 8/07/19 FSC or the 8/21/19 trial. On 8/21/19, the Court dismissed the case.

At this time, Plaintiff moves to set aside the dismissal. Plaintiff’s attorney declares the failure to appear at the FSC and trial was due to a calendaring error in the office. The motion is granted. CCP §473(b).

The Court sets an OSC re: dismissal for failure to file proof of service and failure to prosecute, and for trial setting conference for Monday, 2/24/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.