This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 20:45:46 (UTC).

AMIR TAHBAZ, M.D. VS MAYAR ZOKAEI

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 AMIR TAHBAZ, M D filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAYAR ZOKAEI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3967

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAHBAZ M.D. AMIR AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

ZOKAEI MAYAR AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISHARAT NABIL

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL)

6/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Judgment - JUDGMENT FORM JUD-100

4/30/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT FORM JUD-100

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 04/30/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

5/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE R...)

3/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE R...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/27/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMIR TAHBAZ, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMIR TAHBAZ, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NABIL BISHARAT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

1/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NABIL BISHARAT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Summary of the Case

1/27/2020: Summary of the Case

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/26/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

11/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/29/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/1/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/1/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment (Supplemental)); Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment); Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketJudgment (Form JUD-100); Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 04/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Ruling on Default Judgment (Submitted 1/27/20)) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review Re R...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Management Conference); Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Amir, Tahbaz, M.D., an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NABIL A. BISHARAT